Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Olçomendy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1901Born
29 May 192624.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Jan 194745.3AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
1 Jun 194745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
19 Sep 195352.0AppointedArchbishop of Malacca, Singapore
3 Feb 197775.4RetiredArchbishop of Singapore
4 Jul 197775.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Singapore

MicroData Summary for Michel Olçomendy
Archbishop Michel Olçomendy M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne-de-Baïgorry, France

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast