Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert-Pierre Falière, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1888BornRieupeyroux, France
7 Mar 191425.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Jun 193042.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
3 Jul 193042.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clysma
18 Oct 193042.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clysma
1 Jan 195566.5AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
19 Dec 195971.4RetiredArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
19 Dec 195971.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
12 Jan 196879.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Albert-Pierre Falière:
Archbishop Albert-Pierre Falière M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013