Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien-Pierre Devals, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca, Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1882Born
29 Jun 190623.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Nov 193351.0AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
15 Apr 193451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
17 Jan 194562.1DiedBishop of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for Adrien-Pierre Devals
Bishop Adrien-Pierre Devals M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Malacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuins, France

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast