Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Marie-Joseph Perros, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangkok

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1870BornGuewenheim, France
15 Oct 189323.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Sep 190939.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand
17 Sep 190939.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
30 Jan 191039.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
12 Jul 194777.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand
27 Nov 195282.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangkok, Thailand

MicroData Summary for René-Marie-Joseph Perros:
Bishop René-Marie-Joseph Perros M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangkok

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013