Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constant-Jean-Baptiste Prodhomme, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Laos

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1849BornGorron, France
30 May 187425.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Jun 191364.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laos
2 Jun 191364.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
14 Sep 191364.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
20 Aug 192071.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Laos

MicroData Summary for Constant-Jean-Baptiste Prodhomme:
Bishop Constant-Jean-Baptiste Prodhomme M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Laos

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013