Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudius-Philippe Bayet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1900BornApinac, France
28 Mar 192525.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Apr 194747.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laos
10 Apr 194747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
3 Oct 194747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
21 Dec 195050.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thare, Thailand
7 May 195353.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ubon, Thailand
18 Dec 196565.9AppointedBishop of Ubon, Thailand
13 Aug 196969.5ResignedBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
13 Aug 196969.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
22 Dec 197070.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Mascula
19 Aug 199090.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Claudius-Philippe Bayet:
Bishop Claudius-Philippe Bayet M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 100
  • ab/2m50: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013