Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Sanguon Souvannasri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chanthaburi, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1909Born
9 Feb 193626.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 195343.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chantaburi, Thailand
8 Jan 195343.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Oenoanda
22 Apr 195343.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oenoanda
18 Dec 196556.0AppointedBishop of Chantaburi, Thailand
3 Apr 197060.3ResignedBishop of Chanthaburi, Thailand
3 Apr 197060.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Urci
22 Dec 197061.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Urci
24 Jul 198373.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chanthaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Sanguon Souvannasri
Bishop Francis Xavier Sanguon Souvannasri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chanthaburi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaowapha

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018