Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chanthaburi

Dioecesis Chanthaburiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 July 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangkok
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 34,000 (13,132 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Chanthaburi Diocesan Center 21/3, M.1, Tambol Surasach Sriracha, Chonburi 20110, Thailand
  • Telephone: (038)312.708
  • Fax: 323.577

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Chantaburi
11 May 1944ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Vicariate Apostolic of Chantaburi (erected)
Diocese of Chantaburi
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chantaburi Diocese of Chantaburi
Diocese of Chanthaburi
2 July 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Chantaburi Diocese of Chanthaburi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Chantaburi
195012,3803,200,734.4%20206196716ap1951
Diocese of Chantaburi
Diocese of Chanthaburi
196921,0791,464,6291.4%376434903417217ap1971
198025,5882,987,000.9%405455683419626ap1981
199028,2513,190,000.9%4913624553617738ap1991
199930,8564,064,872.8%6113744163618950ap2000
200031,1554,128,389.8%6312754153919641ap2001
200131,3844,165,818.8%7114853693819141ap2002
200231,1784,228,388.7%7315883544319441ap2003
200337,9144,286,475.9%7415894263319641ap2004
200438,8804,333,797.9%7414884413020041ap2005
200637,1494,445,881.8%7817953915720742ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 4 Jan 2012