Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ratchaburi

Dioecesis Ratchaburensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 26 June 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangkok
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 31,362 (12,113 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 31/2-4 Somboonkul Road, Ratchburi 70000, Thailand
  • Telephone: (032)31.47.28
  • Fax: 323.184

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Rajaburi
30 June 1930ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Mission "Sui Iuris" of Rajaburi (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Rajaburi
28 May 1934ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Rajaburi Prefecture Apostolic of Rajaburi
Vicariate Apostolic of Rajaburi
3 April 1941ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Rajaburi Vicariate Apostolic of Rajaburi
Diocese of Bangnokhuek
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Rajaburi Diocese of Bangnokhuek
Diocese of Ratburi
21 October 1966Name ChangedDiocese of Bangnokhuek Diocese of Ratburi
26 June 1969Territory LostDiocese of Ratburi Diocese of Surat Thani (erected)
Diocese of Ratchaburi
26 June 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Ratburi Diocese of Ratchaburi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Rajaburi
194910,3892,541,039.4%728352962240ap1951
Diocese of Bangnokhuek
Diocese of Ratburi
Diocese of Ratchaburi
197013,5431,041,4441.3%211233410175112ap1971
198016,2481,693,5251.0%191029560157613ap1981
199015,9622,042,462.8%2817453543411825ap1991
199915,1362,221,267.7%4318612482411333ap2000
200015,3462,259,493.7%4518632432311333ap2001
200115,2462,264,970.7%5020702173511533ap2002
200215,4272,281,014.7%521870220348633ap2003
200315,3672,298,585.7%541872213248223ap2004
200415,7302,327,381.7%561369227198233ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 15 Dec 2011