Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bosco Panya Kritcharoen

Bishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1949 Born
22 May 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ratchaburi, Thailand
18 Mar 200555.2AppointedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
28 May 200555.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for John Bosco Panya Kritcharoen
Bishop John Bosco Panya Kritcharoen (born ) Bishop of Ratchaburi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangtan-Banpong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ratchaburi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018