Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ek Thabping

Deceased

Bishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1934Born
20 Dec 195925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ratchaburi, Thailand
2 Oct 197541.5AppointedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
17 Jan 197641.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
12 Feb 198550.8DiedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ek Thabping
Bishop Joseph Ek Thabping (born , died ) Bishop of Ratchaburi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDon Mottanoi

  • a priest for 25.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017