Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Ratna Bamrungtrakul

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiang Mai, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1916Born
31 Jan 194932.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 196953.3AppointedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
7 Sep 196953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
28 Apr 197559.2AppointedBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand
17 Oct 198670.6ResignedBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand
8 Dec 200084.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiang Mai, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Robert Ratna Bamrungtrakul
Bishop Robert Ratna Bamrungtrakul (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiang Mai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangkok

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017