Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Moretti

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belgium

Titular Archbishop of Vartana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1923 BornMeina, Italy
28 Jun 194723.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 197147.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vartana
9 Sep 197147.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Thailand
9 Sep 197147.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
9 Sep 197147.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
9 Sep 197147.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Singapore
24 Oct 197147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vartana
13 Mar 197854.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sudan
10 Jul 198460.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
15 Jul 198965.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
15 Jul 198965.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
3 Mar 199975.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
3 Mar 199975.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Moretti:
Archbishop Giovanni Moretti (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Belgium

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Belgium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013