Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chusak Sirisut

Bishop of Nakhon Ratchasima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1956 BornBang Nok Kwek
11 May 198428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ratchaburi, Thailand
30 Nov 200650.8AppointedBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand
10 Feb 200751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chusak Sirisut:
Bishop Joseph Chusak Sirisut (born ) Bishop of Nakhon Ratchasima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nakhon Ratchasima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013