Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nakhon Ratchasima

Dioecesis Nakhonratchasimaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 July 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 41,148 (15,893 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 387 Suranari Road, Nakhon Ratchasima 30000, Thailand
  • Telephone: (044)241.840
  • Fax: 275.254

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nakhorn-Rajasima
22 March 1965ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ubon Vicariate Apostolic of Nakhorn-Rajasima (erected)
Diocese of Nakhorn-Rajasima
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nakhorn-Rajasima Diocese of Nakhorn-Rajasima
Diocese of Nakhon Ratchasima
2 July 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Nakhorn-Rajasima Diocese of Nakhon Ratchasima

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nakhon Ratchasima
19702,9762,445,414.1%10102971412ap1971
19804,3953,671,000.1%510152931326ap1981
19905,2114,631,000.1%191927443636ap1991
19995,3325,050,570.1%2232521373836ap2000
20005,3915,120,520.1%2242620783826ap2001
20015,2045,168,436.1%2232520833426ap2002
20025,2845,168,436.1%2332620363328ap2003
20035,2585,180,465.1%2332620263228ap2004
20045,4645,198,400.1%2132422763228ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011