Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani

Dioecesis Ubonratchathaniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 July 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 53,917 (20,825 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholicubon.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 5, 498 Chayangkoon Road, Ubon Ratchathani 34000, Thailand
  • Telephone: (045)31.34.39
  • Fax: 28.36.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ubon
7 May 1953ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Thare Vicariate Apostolic of Ubon (erected)
22 March 1965Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ubon Vicariate Apostolic of Nakhorn-Rajasima (erected)
Diocese of Ubon
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ubon Diocese of Ubon
Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani
2 July 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Ubon Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani
197012,7063,900,000.3%334,235313020ap1971
198017,2916,392,242.3%521266652412657ap1981
199020,3716,967,970.3%17173459924134ap1991
199923,5907,573,620.3%2411356741414325ap2000
200024,3107,725,668.3%2411356941414825ap2001
200124,7607,770,793.3%2710376691215422ap2002
200224,9677,838,608.3%3010406241214622ap2003
200325,2017,841,117.3%3210426001215624ap2004
200425,5717,921,032.3%3210426081216155ap2005
201026,2427,785,113.3%328406561316958ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013