Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Banchong Chaiyara, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Ubon Ratchathani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1945 BornChang Ming
2 Aug 196924.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Jun 197530.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Mar 200661.2AppointedBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
27 Jun 200661.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Philip Banchong Chaiyara:
Bishop Philip Banchong Chaiyara C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Ubon Ratchathani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ubon Ratchathani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,178
  • c4: CB
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013