Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Weradet Chaiseri

Archbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1963 Born
21 Mar 199228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
13 May 202056.8AppointedArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
15 Aug 202057.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Anthony Weradet Chaiseri
Archbishop Anthony Weradet Chaiseri (born ) Archbishop of Thare and Nonseng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTharé, Vicariate Apostolic of Thare and Nonseng
Ordained BishopSaint Michael the Archangel, Cathedral, Tharé, Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 29 May 2020
  • c2: CB, 15 Jul 2020
  • c34: CB, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Aug 2020

Quantcast