Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bosco Manat Chuabsamai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ratchaburi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1935BornBang Nok Huek
10 May 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rajaburi, Thailand
25 Nov 198550.1AppointedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
6 Jan 198650.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
24 Jul 200367.7ResignedBishop of Ratchaburi, Thailand
20 Oct 201176.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ratchaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for John Bosco Manat Chuabsamai:
Bishop John Bosco Manat Chuabsamai (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ratchaburi

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Oct 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013