Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Mongkhol On Prakhongchit

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Thare, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Blaundus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1905Born
23 Dec 193328.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 195347.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thare, Thailand
7 May 195347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Blaundus
19 Aug 195348.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blaundus
23 Jan 195852.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Thare, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michael Mongkhol On Prakhongchit
Bishop Michael Mongkhol On Prakhongchit (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Thare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangkok

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018