Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Maung Kyaw

Deceased

Bishop of Bassein, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1917Born
12 Oct 194326.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 195537.7AppointedBishop of Bassein, Myanmar
17 Apr 195538.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bassein, Myanmar
19 Nov 196750.6DiedBishop of Bassein, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for George Maung Kyaw
Bishop George Maung Kyaw (born , died ) Bishop of Bassein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyaunggon

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017