Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Lee Hiong Fun-Yit Yaw

Archbishop Emeritus of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1933--> Born
27 Dec 196431.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jesselton, Malaysia
30 Mar 198753.4AppointedBishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
26 Jun 198753.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
23 May 200874.6AppointedArchbishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
1 Dec 201279.1RetiredArchbishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for John Lee Hiong Fun-Yit Yaw
(WikiData: Q530853)
Archbishop John Lee Hiong Fun-Yit Yaw (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kota Kinabalu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKota Kinabalu, Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}
Ordained BishopS. Coeur, Cathedral, Kota Kinabalu, Diocese of Kota Kinabalu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu.

  • a priest for --> years
  • a bishop for --> years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,799
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024