Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu

Archidioecesis Kotakinabaluensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Wong Soo Kau, Archbishop
  • John Lee Hiong Fun-Yit Yaw, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 May 2008
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malaysia
  • Square Kilometers: 55,215 (21,326 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kkdiocese.net/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 10289, 88803 Kota Kinabalu, Sabah, Malaysia
  • Telephone: (088)712.297
  • Fax: 711.954

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo
4 September 1855ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo (erected)
5 February 1927Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo Prefecture Apostolic of Sarawak (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}
5 February 1927Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Jesselton
14 February 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Jesselton
Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu
22 March 1968Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Jesselton Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu
Diocese of Kota Kinabalu
31 May 1976ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu Diocese of Kota Kinabalu
17 December 1992Territory LostDiocese of Kota Kinabalu Diocese of Keningau (erected)
16 July 2007Territory LostDiocese of Kota Kinabalu Diocese of Sandakan (erected)
Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu
23 May 2008ElevatedDiocese of Kota Kinabalu Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}
195014,614280,0005.2%333344245ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Jesselton
Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Kinabalu
197072,028601,48812.0%1245571,2635881ap1971
Diocese of Kota Kinabalu
1980121,014970,00012.5%177245,042169029ap1981
1990180,6941,425,35012.7%233266,9491310127ap1991
1999182,3912,415,2007.6%302325,6991414619ap2000
2000187,6092,577,7997.3%353384,937814819ap2001
2001192,8282,621,9007.4%322345,6711015219ap2002
2002198,0472,840,9007.0%351365,501813919ap2003
2003202,0082,981,9006.8%351365,611814419ap2004
2004205,0733,122,9006.6%311326,4081114419ap2005
Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 1 Dec 2012