Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edmund Dunn, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Sarawak, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1857Born
18 Dec 188023.0Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
4 May 189739.4AppointedPrefect of Labuan e Borneo, Malaysia
5 Feb 192769.2AppointedPrefect of Sarawak, Malaysia
31 Dec 193376.1DiedPrefect of Sarawak, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Edmund Dunn
Father Edmund Dunn M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Sarawak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDolphin's Bar, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Thomas, Seminary, Hammersmith, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 53.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018