Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Wong Soo Kau

Archbishop of Kota Kinabalu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1968 BornSandakan
21 Jan 199930.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
16 Jul 200739.1IncardinatedPriest of Sandakan, Malaysia
21 Jun 201042.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
1 Oct 201042.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
1 Dec 201244.5SucceededArchbishop of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for John Wong Soo Kau:
Archbishop John Wong Soo Kau (born ) Archbishop of Kota Kinabalu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kota Kinabalu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,850
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013