Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Dusin Gitom

Bishop of Sandakan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1957 BornKampung Loltos
19 Nov 198932.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
16 Jul 200749.8AppointedBishop of Sandakan, Malaysia
15 Oct 200750.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sandakan, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Julius Dusin Gitom:
Bishop Julius Dusin Gitom (born ) Bishop of Sandakan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sandakan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013