Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father August Wachter, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1878Born
6 Dec 190324.9Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
26 Jul 192748.6AppointedPrefect of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}, Malaysia
6 Aug 194566.6DiedPrefect of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for August Wachter
Father August Wachter M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Northern Borneo {Borneo Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBludenz, Austria

  • a priest for 41.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018