Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Lee Kok Hin

Bishop Emeritus of Miri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1937 BornMiri
2 Jan 196628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Miri, Malaysia
30 May 197740.2AppointedBishop of Miri, Malaysia
20 Nov 197740.7Ordained BishopBishop of Miri, Malaysia
30 Oct 201376.6RetiredBishop of Miri, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Lee Kok Hin:
Bishop Anthony Lee Kok Hin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Miri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014