Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Miri

Dioecesis Miriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Richard Ng, Bishop
  • Anthony Lee Kok Hin, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 31 May 1976
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kuching
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malaysia
  • Square Kilometers: 42,235 (16,313 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rc.net/malaysia/miri/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 108, Tanjong Lobang, 98007 Miri, Sarawak, Malaysia
  • Telephone: (085)33587
  • Fax: 415-135

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Miri
19 December 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kuching Vicariate Apostolic of Miri (erected)
Diocese of Miri
31 May 1976ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Miri Diocese of Miri
21 November 1997Territory LostDiocese of Miri Prefecture Apostolic of Brunei (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Miri
197015,484182,0008.5%2924532922720ap1971
Diocese of Miri
198030,141335,0009.0%716231,310171732ap1981
199043,550720,0006.0%104143,11041713ap1991
199756,774517,00011.0%96153,78471412ap2003

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014