Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Denis Galvin, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miri, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1919Born
29 Jun 194425.4Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
5 Apr 196041.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Miri, Malaysia
5 Apr 196041.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
8 May 196041.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
31 May 197657.3AppointedBishop of Miri, Malaysia
5 Sep 197657.5DiedBishop of Miri, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Denis Galvin
Bishop Anthony Denis Galvin M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Miri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrmesby, Great Britain

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast