Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Murphy Nicholas Xavier Pakiam

Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1938 BornTapah
10 May 196425.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 199556.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
1 Apr 199556.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
4 Oct 199556.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
24 May 200364.5AppointedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
29 May 200364.5InstalledArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
13 Dec 201375.0RetiredArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Murphy Nicholas Xavier Pakiam:
Archbishop Murphy Nicholas Xavier Pakiam (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kuala Lumpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,617
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Oct 2014