Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Antonazzo

Bishop of Sora-Cassino-Aquino-Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1956 BornSupersano
12 Sep 198125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
22 Jan 201356.7AppointedBishop of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo, Italy
8 Apr 201356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Antonazzo:
Bishop Gerardo Antonazzo (born ) Bishop of Sora-Cassino-Aquino-Pontecorvo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sora-Cassino-Aquino-Pontecorvo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2013
  • c2: CB, 12 Mar 2013
  • c34: CB, 3 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,762
  • dn: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 25 Oct 2014