Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Slaby, C.SS.R.

Prelate of Esquel, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1958 Born
2 Feb 197920.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Jun 198426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Mar 200951.0AppointedPrelate of Esquel, Argentina
8 May 200951.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Esquel, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Slaby
Bishop José Slaby C.SS.R. (born ) Prelate of Esquel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZeleznikowa, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Esquel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast