Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luis Ronchino, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1928Born
1 Aug 195426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jan 199364.6AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
19 Mar 199364.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
19 Feb 200576.6RetiredBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
1 Jul 202092.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luis Ronchino
Bishop Pedro Luis Ronchino S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario
Ordained BishopGymnase du Club "Ingeniero Luis A. Huergo", Comodoro Rivadavia, Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia
Death PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,110
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 1 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jul 2020

Quantcast