Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Alejandro Cuenca Revuelta

Bishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1956 BornCórdoba
8 Dec 198327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
10 Feb 201053.7AppointedBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
25 Mar 201053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
11 Apr 201053.8InstalledBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Alejandro Cuenca Revuelta:
Bishop Marcelo Alejandro Cuenca Revuelta (born ) Bishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alto Valle del Río Negro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015