Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Randriamanana

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo

Titular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1950BornAntananarivo
9 Sep 197929.2Ordained PriestPriest of Antananarivo, Madagascar
3 Jun 199948.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar
3 Jun 199948.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare
26 Sep 199949.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare
9 Nov 201161.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Randriamanana:
Bishop Jean-Paul Randriamanana (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,632
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013