Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Ngoy Kabwe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1918BornMalemba-Nkulu
26 Sep 194830.4Ordained PriestPriest of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 May 197254.1AppointedBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Sep 197254.4Ordained BishopBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Sep 198971.4ResignedBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 May 200486.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gérard Ngoy Kabwe:
Bishop Gérard Ngoy Kabwe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manono

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013