Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Biletsi Onim

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1934Born
29 Mar 195924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 May 197035.7AppointedBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Sep 197036.0Ordained BishopBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Nov 199460.2ResignedBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Dec 199763.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Eugène Biletsi Onim
Bishop Eugène Biletsi Onim (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbulu (Mwilambongo)
Ordained BishopIdiofa, Diocese of Idiofa

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 727
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast