Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Mbuka-Nzundu

Deceased

Bishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1918Born
11 Aug 194830.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jun 196143.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jun 196143.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
29 Oct 196143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
29 Nov 196749.9AppointedBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Oct 198567.7DiedBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Alexander Mbuka-Nzundu
Bishop Alexander Mbuka-Nzundu (born 1918, died ) Bishop of Kikwit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeverville-Soa

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018