Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Lefèbvre, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1902Born
24 Aug 193432.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
25 Feb 195553.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Feb 195553.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphanea
22 May 195553.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphanea
10 Nov 195957.7AppointedBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Nov 196765.8ResignedBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Nov 196765.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
15 Sep 197674.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
15 May 199189.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for André Lefèbvre
Bishop André Lefèbvre S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kikwit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTournai, Belgium

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018