Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kikwit

Dioecesis Kikuitensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Edouard Mununu Kasiala, O.C.S.O., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kinshasa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 73,000 (28,196 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 7245, Kinshasa 1, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)8464.968

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
31 January 1903ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Koango o Kwango (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
28 March 1928ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Koango o Kwango Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
1 April 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu (erected)
13 April 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
Prefecture Apostolic of Ipamu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kikwit
21 February 1955Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango Vicariate Apostolic of Kikwit
5 July 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kikwit
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu
Prefecture Apostolic of Kenge
Diocese of Kikwit
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kikwit Diocese of Kikwit

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
1950213,821852,03125.1%2172932,2991391204ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kikwit
Diocese of Kikwit
1970623,3751,220,00051.1%321041364,58320030032ap1971
1980787,6781,499,00052.5%29951246,35216319848ap1981
19881,800,0002,367,00076.0%589315111,92019821848ap1991
19991,601,7712,652,92060.4%817315410,40118234350ap2000
20002,002,2143,316,15060.4%846114513,80823632952ap2001
20012,000,3403,489,11457.3%945414813,51515728952ap2002
20021,920,0993,640,00052.7%955214713,06115728552ap2003
20031,850,0003,686,40050.2%895414312,93716529852ap2004
20042,004,8523,809,22052.6%1005415413,01816939552ap2005
20062,478,7853,995,89662.0%1025615815,68817039652ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 27 Feb 2013