Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
18 Feb 1859 | Born | ||
10 Nov 1879 | 20.7 | Entered | Member of Society of Jesus |
1894² | 34.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Society of Jesus |
2 Feb 1897 | 37.9 | Final Vows | Priest of Society of Jesus |
13 Dec 1911 | 52.8 | Appointed | Prefect of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
28 Mar 1928 | 69.1 | Resigned | Prefect of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
24 Jul 1932 | 73.4 | Died | Prefect Emeritus of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Gand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium |
Death Place | Kikwit |
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠