Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kisantu

Dioecesis Kisantuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kinshasa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 31,000 (11,973 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 25, Inkisi, Bas-Congo, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)48.781

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu
1 April 1931ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu (erected)
5 July 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kikwit
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu
Prefecture Apostolic of Kenge
Diocese of Kisantu
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kisantu Diocese of Kisantu
24 June 1961Territory LostDiocese of Kisantu Diocese of Popokabaka (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu
1950183,000440,00041.6%34345,3822210ap1951
Diocese of Kisantu
1970238,654365,84765.2%46611072,23012823195ap1971
1980304,728433,53270.3%4237793,8579321621ap1981
1990473,213572,13682.7%67551223,87820929724ap1991
1999600,000800,00075.0%89401294,65156128523ap2000
2000650,000900,00072.2%94381324,92458030523ap2001
2001650,000900,00072.2%96361324,92435331924ap2002
2002650,000900,00072.2%97211185,50841630024ap2003
2003600,000900,00066.7%95471424,22523569525ap2004
2004601,000900,50066.7%100491494,03319070625ap2005
2006650,000950,60068.4%106531594,08832529325ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Aug 2012