Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Verwimp, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kisantu

Titular Bishop of Gibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1885BornGheel, Belgium
17 May 191731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Jun 193146.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Jun 193146.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Uccula
28 Oct 193146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uccula
10 Nov 195974.4AppointedBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Oct 196075.4RetiredBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Oct 196075.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gibba
11 Oct 196479.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Verwimp:
Bishop Alphonse Verwimp S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kisantu

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015