Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Guffens, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Koango o Kwango

Titular Bishop of Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1895BornBruxelles, Belgium
25 Aug 192631.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Jul 194954.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Jul 194954.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
21 Aug 194954.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
Dec 1954³59.7ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jun 197378.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Guffens:
Bishop Joseph Guffens S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Koango o Kwango

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013