Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Bossart, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ipamu

Titular Bishop of Tigava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1888BornBastogne, Belgium
10 Aug 191324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Jun 193748.6AppointedPrefect of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Feb 194859.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
12 Feb 194859.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 May 194859.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigava
May 1957³68.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Mar 196374.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Bossart:
Bishop Alphonse Bossart O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ipamu

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013