Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie van Cauwenbergh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Synaus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1879Born
20 Sep 190223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
19 Dec 193051.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
19 Dec 193051.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Synaus
11 Feb 193151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Synaus
14 Apr 195071.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie van Cauwenbergh
Bishop Jean Marie van Cauwenbergh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLierre

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast