Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne Joseph Carton de Wiart

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1898BornBruxelles
9 Oct 192123.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 193435.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
16 Jun 193435.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Taium
29 Jul 193435.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taium
8 Jul 194546.9AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
30 Jul 194849.9DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Étienne Joseph Carton de Wiart:
Bishop Étienne Joseph Carton de Wiart (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013