Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Gerrit Joćo Hermanus Maria Horsthuis, A.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jales, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1912BornDiepenveen, Netherlands
26 Feb 193926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
13 Feb 196047.6AppointedBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jun 196047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Nov 196856.3ResignedBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Nov 196856.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
16 Mar 197158.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
11 Apr 197966.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Arturo Gerrit Joćo Hermanus Maria Horsthuis:
Bishop Arturo Gerrit Joćo Hermanus Maria Horsthuis A.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jales

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 74
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 23 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014