Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basile Octave Tanghe, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}

Titular Bishop of Tigava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1879BornBruges, Belgium
21 Sep 190122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Oct 193152.6AppointedPrefect of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Jan 193555.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
28 Jan 193555.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jun 193556.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigava
13 Dec 194768.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Basile Octave Tanghe:
Bishop Basile Octave Tanghe O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013